SINGLE FRIENDLY CHURCH NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research into issues faced by single people. A 5-step audit for churches to identify areas for improvement. Facilitation of a network of churches sharing SFC objectives. Training sessions for churches and theological colleges. Webinars on topics relevant to work with single people. Resources for church leaders including pastoral guides. Resources to enrich the spiritual lives of single Christians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 May 2023: CIO registration
- SINGLE FRIENDLY CHURCH (Working name)
- SINGLE FRIENDLY CHURCH COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Warren Nettleford | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Elton | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kate Elizabeth Wharton | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Amelia Lucy Gosal | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Timothy Roxby Hall | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE, BY PROVIDING TEACHING AND SUPPORT (INCLUDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT) TO CHURCHES AND OTHER CHARITABLE CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS, TO INCREASE ACCESS, INCLUSIVITY, AND ENGAGEMENT WITHIN THE CHURCH AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE SINGLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church House
86 TAVISTOCK PLACE
LONDON
WC1H 9RT
- Phone:
- 02030956249
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window