THE 4566 PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration, preservation and exhibition of the former Great Western Railway Locomotive 4566 and any associated rolling stock, equipment and artefacts, relics, documents and records of historic and scientific interest to advance the education of the public. We primarily operate in the Kidderminster area of the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Gordon Whitlam | Chair | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Delaney | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Robert George Ballard | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Holford STREVENS | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHEENA JANE STREVENS | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHRISTOPHER FATHERS | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jane Thompson | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Thomas Joseph CLARKE | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE GREAT WESTERN RAILWAY BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF THE FORMER GREAT WESTERN RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVE NUMBER 4566 AND ANY ASSOCIATED ROLLING STOCK, EQUIPMENT AND ARTEFACTS, RELICS, DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS OF HISTORIC AND SCIENTIFIC INTEREST AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE TECHNICAL SKILLS REQUIRED TO RESTORE AND PRESERVE THE SAID LOCOMOTIVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Essen Lane
Kilsby
RUGBY
Northamptonshire
CV23 8XQ
- Phone:
- 07769577007
- Email:
- secretary@4566.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window