SOUTH YORKSHIRE CHARITY MENTORS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community capacity building, through supporting & mentoring leaders of community & voluntary sector organisations in South Yorkshire. Providing the support and eduction to acquire and develop the strategic skills, competencies & self confidence to improve the effectiveness & sustainability of their groups for the delivery of charitable work for the benefit of the community.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Paul Pedder OBE DL | Chair | 29 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Cameron Mclennan | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Viner | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Koseoglu | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Nancy Clare Bernard | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hallam | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Ruth Elizabeth Willis | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HIGH QUALITY MENTORING TO LEADERS OF COMMUNITY, VOLUNTARY AND CHARITABLE SECTOR ORGANISATIONS IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND THE PROVISION OF ONE TO ONE MENTORING AND LEADERSHIP PROGRAMMES ENABLING THE LEADERS, TRUSTEES AND MANAGERS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP THE SKILLS, COMPETENCIES, CONFIDENCE AND POTENTIAL TO IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ORGANISATIONS IN THE DELIVERY OF THEIR CHARITABLE WORK. (THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DEFINED AS FOLLOWS: ‘CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH YORKSHIRE CHARITY MENTORS
C/O SYCF
THE HIGH GREEN CDT CAMPUS
PACK HORSE LANE
SHEFFIELD
S35 3HY
- Phone:
- +447805306572
- Email:
- sycharitymentors@sycm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.