NORTH BIRMINGHAM METHODIST HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) The provision of regular acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members alike; b) The provision of sacred space (a building) for prayer and contemplation; c) The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups; d) Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved; e) Taking religious assemblies in local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 18 September 2023: Standard registration
- BOLDMERE METHODIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Emily Rosalind Alice Young | Chair | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrew Howard | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abiodun Kayode Obanla | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Florence May O'Connor | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Francis Hodgetts | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Julie Hele | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Ratcliffe | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES ANDREWS | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
MARGARET EVETTE HENRY | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
JUDITH ANN STEPHENS | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER JOAN McGREGOR BSc CPFA | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Christine Mary Blake | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY LAWRENCE WILKINSON | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
KATHLEEN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Harry Vaughan White | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Mark Hurst BSc | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Alison Burland | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian White | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dezereine Amutea Wilks | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Rachel Margaret Thomas-Prasad | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 ORPHANAGE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B24 9HX
- Phone:
- 01213865612
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window