SAXBY-ALL-SAINTS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
village hall for the village of Saxby all Saints
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 17 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Holland | Chair | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Moffat | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Hunter | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharron Lesley Simpson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Addison | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Bates | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason White | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Leitch | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane James | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Rogers | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Fagge | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS CHARLES HOPE BARTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.55k | £667 | £2.72k | £9.11k | £10.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.64k | £2.05k | £3.41k | £6.82k | £8.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 1964 LEASE DATED 12TH NOVEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
SAXBY-ALL-SAINTS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mistle House
Main Street
Saxby-All-Saints
Brigg
DN20 0PZ
- Phone:
- 01652618615
- Email:
- johnfagge@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window