WALLASEY VILLAGE LIBRARY & COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was established following a successful application to Wirral Borough Council to secure the future of the library via their 'Community Asset Transfer' process. The charity seeks to reopen the building, maintaining a library, freely available to residents, while also incorporating a dedicated community space and a cafe.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wirral
Governance
- 22 August 2023: CIO registration
- 02 January 2024: Funds received from 213990 THE LONSDALE TRUST WALLASEY
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephenie Walsh | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Jane Pugh | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stephen Byrne | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Sarah Sturgess | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Alderton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Duggan | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Simpson | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Major Bill Wyllie | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Lyons | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lewis | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WALLASEY, WIRRAL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES, BY OPERATING AND MANAGING A COMMUNITY LENDING LIBRARY; (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF WALLASEY, WIRRAL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES, THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR RECREATION AND/OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wallasey Village Library
St George's Road
Wallasey
Wirral
CH45 3NE
- Phone:
- 01516386014
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.