THE CANTERBURY DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE DEAF
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Deaf and Hard of Hearing People in any area of need during life time events and Charity activities. Activities and Church services BSL signed
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 17 October 2023: CIO registration
- 24 April 2024: Funds received from 209065 THE CANTERBURY DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE DEAF
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miranda Ford | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Mohanaei | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Palmer | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Allen Arnold | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THEIR SPIRITUAL, SOCIAL AND GENERAL WELFARE AND THEIR INCLUSION IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Tanners Street
FAVERSHAM
Kent
ME13 7JP
- Phone:
- 01795227202
- Email:
- trigpointx@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.