STAMFORD AND BOURNE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training young people in Social,Sports,Citizenship and Outward Bound skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 20 January 1992: Standard registration
- STAMFORD AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Tagg | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Nelson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke John Houghton | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Diane Elizabeth Siddle | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Nathan John Wakefield | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Haxeltine | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Herron | Trustee | 20 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Martin Neil Siddle | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Alistair Wemyss Cobbold | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR KEITH WATSON | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.53k | £40.79k | £74.24k | £101.36k | £79.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.48k | £34.46k | £50.27k | £97.96k | £67.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 3RD MARCH 1969 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
SCOUT DISTRICT
Area of benefit
STAMFORD, BORNE, MARKET DEEPING AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
School House
Bitchfield
GRANTHAM
NG33 4DR
- Phone:
- 07377451597
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window