OTFORD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1204291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian worship in Otford at the Methodist Church building.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £110,228
Total expenditure: £155,112

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jane Elizabeth Braund Chair 01 September 2024
WEALD OF KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Robin James Carlyon Evans Trustee 03 June 2024
None on record
Rosemary Vanessa Cracknell Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Ann Evelyn Suaznabar Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Jean Mair Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Eileen Ann Graham Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
SUSAN JANE WILKINS Trustee 01 September 2022
WEALD OF KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Alison Margaret Alexandra Knapp Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
John Andrew Goodburn Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Christine Ruth Cable Trustee 29 October 2021
None on record
Mark Jones Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Susan Jane Ward Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Fraser Ian Mair Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Shirley Goodburn Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Susan Mary Mitchell Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Alistair Charles Mitchell Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Robert Heddle Paterson Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Susan Carol Cole Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Jane Patricia Pearce Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
DEREK MICHAEL BAXTER Trustee 20 September 2019
None on record
ARMANDA ELAINE ROWELL MMRCGP,DR Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Kathryn Baxter Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
John Douglas Ward Trustee 10 May 2015
None on record
Iris Janet Goodwin Trustee 10 May 2015
None on record
Dr Nicholas Philip Rowell Trustee 10 May 2015
None on record
Carol Ann Oakley Trustee 17 May 2014
WEALD OF KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev John Stuart Curnow Trustee 01 September 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2024
Total gross income £110.23k
Total expenditure £155.11k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 12 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 12 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Otford Methodist Church
High Street
Otford
SEVENOAKS
TN14 5PH
Phone:
01959523090