Trustees NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 522422

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Craigs | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bell | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Williams | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Victoria Kinneavy | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allison Walters | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Ternent | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hughes | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Welsh | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Knight | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan King | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Collins | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dennis | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY DE BONO-HUME | Trustee | 04 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN TEASDALE | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pagan | Trustee | 02 April 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.