1ST CHILWELL AND ATTENBOROUGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 October 1964: Standard registration
- 13 December 2022: Funds received from 505887 AGE CONCERN CHILWELL
- 1ST CHILWELL AND ATTENBOROUGH BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Glover | Chair | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Traynor | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Michelle Jepson | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wignell | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Eunice Plumbley | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Connor Michael Lynch | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Charles Thompson | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PETER SHORT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.53k | £45.26k | £23.92k | £37.18k | £69.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.53k | £29.67k | £24.46k | £50.84k | £66.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.29k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 24TH JUNE, 1964 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.
Charitable objects
1ST CHILWELL AND ATTENBOROUGH BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
CHILWELL AND ATTENBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Banks Road
Toton
Beeston
Nottingham
NG9 6HE
- Phone:
- 01158778972
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window