ST MARY AND ST MOSES THE PROPHET COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, DONCASTER

Charity number: 1204736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Objectives of the Charity (the Objects) shall be to advance and promote the Christian Faith in accordance with the teachings and practices of the Coptic Orthodox Church. 2 For the purpose of attaining the aforesaid Object but not otherwise, the Charity may exercise the following powers: (a) to provide and maintain a place or places of public worship for worship and officiating sacraments

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £71,879
Total expenditure: £27,195

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 September 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
His Grace BISHOP ANTONY Chair 17 September 2022
ST. MICHAEL & ST. BISHOY COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST ABANOUB COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, WEST AND NORTH YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST GEORGE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH PLYMOUTH
Received: On time
ST GEORGE AND ST ATHANASIOUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST. ANTONY COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST PETER AND ST PAUL COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH BOURNEMOUTH
Received: On time
ST MARINA COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH-BRISTOL
Received: On time
ARCHANGEL MICHAEL & SAINT MINA COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST MARY & ST THEODORE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, HASTINGS
Received: On time
ST JOHN COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST AUGUSTINE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST ATHANASIUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST. ATHANASIUS MONASTERY
Received: On time
St Mary and St John Coptic Orthodox Church and Centre
Recently registered
Dr Tamer Tadross Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Dr Kerolos Awad Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Dr Peter Said Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Dr Michael Ghabour Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Dr Evon Boules Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Beshoy Isaac Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Dr Maher Attia Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Andrew Metry Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2024
Total gross income £71.88k
Total expenditure £27.20k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 01 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 SKIPWITH GARDENS
NEW ROSSINGTON
DONCASTER
DN11 0TU
Phone:
07466476856
Website:

No information available