WEST BRIDGFORD (NOTTS ) DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The guiding programme is underlined by the following five essentials, namely 1. Guides of all ages work together in small groups. 2. They are encouraged to govern themselves and make their own decisions. 3. They enjoy a balanced, varied & challenging programme designed to help them achieve their potential . 4. They care for the individual.5 We have a commitment to a common standard
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 January 1971: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING WEST BRIDGFORD (Working name)
- WEST BRIDGFORD (NOTTS ) DIVISION GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Crew | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Clare Louise Wicks | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Lucas | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wicks | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Esther Janet Alix Prentice Nielsen | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Gurd | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alice Wicks | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.43k | £18.34k | £11.61k | £12.67k | £9.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.58k | £14.56k | £16.88k | £9.59k | £15.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £8.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 14/12/1922.
Charitable objects
INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
WEST BRIDGFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paxdien
Rectory Road
West Bridgford
Notingham
NG2 6BG
- Phone:
- 07789918233
- Email:
- wbstfinance@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window