Keele Village Hall

Charity number: 522680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides facilities for village organisations to meet e.g. Keele Parish Council, Keele Garden Club, fitness groups, Keele Parish Church meetings, wedding receptions, birthday parties, funeral wakes etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,066
Total expenditure: £6,960

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KEELE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
  • VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Mary Dean Trustee 14 March 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, CHESTERTON, LICHFIELD
Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days
STEPS ROMANIA
Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days
SAMANTHA JANE SUMMERFIELD Trustee 14 March 2024
None on record
John Roy Evans Trustee 14 March 2024
None on record
Sarah Luncinda Evans Trustee 14 March 2024
None on record
Owen Rhys Dyde Trustee 09 May 2023
NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
SUE HUGHES Trustee 30 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.10k £23.09k £17.88k £7.86k £8.07k
Total expenditure £2.45k £6.66k £17.56k £8.80k £6.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.43k £2.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 February 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Keele Village Hall
Highway Lane
Keele
NEWCASTLE
Staffordshire
ST5 5AN
Phone:
01782613805
Email:
No information available
Website:

Www.keelevillagehall.org.uk