PENDLE NEW NEIGHBOURS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pendle New Neighbours supports refugees and asylum seekers living in Pendle by: Advice, support, advocacy, interpreting, translating and signposting to other services. English classes (informal ESOL) and other opportunities for learning the language. Trips and visits. Relief of poverty or financial hardship by making small grants. Social and recreational events in the local community.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 October 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Elizabeth Thomas MBE | Chair | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adela Akbari | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vitalii Malyshko | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wren | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Philip Thomas | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Saba Iftikhar | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL PAUL GAUNTLETT BEM | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Joseph Vickers | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE LIVING IN THE PENDLE AREA, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (1) ADVICE, SUPPORT, ADVOCACY, INTERPRETING, TRANSLATING, AND SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER SERVICES. (2) ENGLISH CLASSES AND OTHER OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE. (3) TRIPS AND VISITS TO UK CITIES, TOWNS, AND COUNTRY TO LEARN ABOUT OUR HERITAGE, TRADITIONS, AND CULTURE. (4) RELIEF FROM POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY MAKING EMERGENCY SMALL GRANTS AND DISTRIBUTING FUNDS FROM OTHER ORGANISATIONS. (5) SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. (6) INFORMATION AND EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 203, Pendle Business Centre,
Commercial Road
Nelson
Lancashire
BB9 9BT
- Phone:
- 07469979915
- Email:
- Pnn@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.