ST MARTIN'S YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 522878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Centre provides activities for young people aged 10-19. The programme includes media & music, arts, crafts & dance workshops, sports activities, holiday programmes, residentials and open access sessions. For those involved in/likely to be involved in, antisocial/criminal behaviour the Centre provides alternative challenges. The Centre is a community resource which can be hired for events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £46,445
Total expenditure: £77,738

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 1965: Standard registration
  • 09 October 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 December 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ST MARTINS YOUTH & COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JEREMY ROBERT ALLCOCK Chair 11 March 2019
ST MARTIN'S SUNDAY SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Stephen Blaire-Chappell Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Robert Laurence Jones Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
PAULINE WRIGHT Trustee 01 November 2015
None on record
TREVOR LEWIS Trustee 30 January 2012
None on record
BRIDGET KATHLEEN CAREY CAMERON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £111.46k £87.21k £36.35k £83.00k £46.45k
Total expenditure £76.92k £57.15k £49.07k £62.88k £77.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £74.52k £12.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST MARTIN'S YOUTH & COMMUNITY CTR
GOOCH STREET
HIGHGATE
BIRMINGHAM
B5 7HE
Phone:
01216222005
Website:

www://smycc.blogspot.com