LUDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Use by organisations for various activities, dance classes, art classes, folk groups etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 01 October 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Christopher Thorpe | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Louise Radden | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Penny Garbutt | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Haines | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Haines-Lea | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brian Wallis | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Heyworth | Trustee | 07 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.69k | £5.13k | £25.69k | £19.08k | £26.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.13k | £7.26k | £6.89k | £15.65k | £18.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.67k | £2.67k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 7TH APRIL 1952
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LUDDINGTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Forge
Luddington
Stratford upon Avon
Stratford upon Avon
Stratford upon Avon
Warwicks
- Phone:
- 07803575090
- Email:
- luddingtonvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window