BELIFTED NOW
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BeLifted is a nonprofit empowering women, girls, and families through various programs. Our debt and welfare surgery offers personalised financial support; well-being groups for mothers and daughters promote health and resilience; our running group for women encourages fitness and community; kids' fitness classes instilling healthy habits; and our book club for children fosters a love of reading.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
Governance
- 21 August 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer McCall | Chair | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Aujla | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Rogers | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fanta Sheriff | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Nkromah | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR AMONG WOMEN AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN NORTH WEST LONDON BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL EDUCATION TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO MANAGE THEIR FINANCES MORE EFFECTIVELY; (B) THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING SERVICE TO WHICH PERSONS MAY RESORT FOR ADVICE ON DEBT MATTERS GENERALLY; AND (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST PERSONS IN DEBT OR AT RISK OF FALLING INTO DEBT) ON THE SUBJECT OF FINANCIAL BUDGETING, FINANCIAL PRODUCTS AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF ENGLISH BY PROVISION OF A BOOK CLUB FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE HOME SCHOOLED AND THE PROVISION OF AFTERSCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. 3. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH WEST LONDON, IN PARTICULAR WOMEN AND GIRLS AGED BETWEEN 12 AND 16 YEARS OLD, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR TAKING PART IN FUNCTIONAL FITNESS ACTIVITIES AND PROGRAMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
170 ALL SOULS AVENUE
LONDON
NW10 3AB
- Phone:
- 07507312312
- Email:
- beliftednow@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.