METHODIST CHURCH GORNAL AND SEDGLEY CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

28 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 December 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Colin John Hartley | Chair | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Emma Jane Newton | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Jones | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wiiliam Caldwell | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Timmins | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Marjorie Bennett | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Parker | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joy Rogers | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ratcliffe | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Dee | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Ann Smith | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Parker | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Maureen Priest | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Howard Raybould | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jayne Morris | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Checketts | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Gill | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elaine Hyde | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antoinette Jackson | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Teresa Watchorn | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Parker | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Michael Donnison | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Rebecca Jones | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Charles Turner | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Leighton Amplett | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM PAUL WATCHORN | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Olwen Beardsmore | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 Viewfield Crescent
DUDLEY
DY3 3UL
- Phone:
- 01902560126
- Email:
- rev_john_hartley@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window