GUILDFORD IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Michael Spooner | Chair | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH NAPP | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||
John David Service | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Diana Maria Roberts | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT GUILDFORD BY THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH DIRECTLY PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN GUILDFORD BY THE PROMOTION OF PRACTICAL MEASURES AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF PARTNERSHIPS IMPROVE THE GENERAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE LOCAL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Queens Drive
Guildford
GU2 9PP
- Phone:
- 07860476261
- Email:
- info@guildfordinbloom.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window