Southampton Hospitals Charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhancing the care and treatment of patients at University Hospital Southampton NHS Foundation Trust by providing support to areas of the hospital service that lie beyond the scope of NHS funding.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
- Guernsey
- Jersey
Governance
- 06 February 2024: Standard registration
- 29 May 2024: Funds received from 1051543 SOUTHAMPTON HOSPITALS CHARITY
- SOUTHAMPTON HOSPITALS COMPANY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Thomas Hollins | Chair | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Potter | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gail Margaret Byrne | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Maria Southwood | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Edmund Smith | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JAN 2024 as amended on 18 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE. NHS FOUNDATION TRUST IS DEFINED AS: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL SOUTHAMPTON NHS FOUNDATION TRUST OR ANY STATUTORY BODY TO WHOM THE FUNCTIONS OR ACTIVITIES OF THE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST ARE TRANSFERRED BY LEGISLATION RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE OR BY ORDER OF ANY RELEVANT REGULATORY BODY AND WHOSE ACTIVITIES CAN BE SUPPORTED BY THE CHARITY PURSUANT TO THE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southampton Hospitals Charity
Mailpoint 135
Southampton General Hospital
Tremona Road
Southampton
SO16 6YD
- Phone:
- 02381208881
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.