ALFRICK AND LULSLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523088
Charity reporting is up to date (143 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide a facility & location for local community groups to meet. Also hall available for hire for private functions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,209
Total expenditure: £19,020

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALFRICK PEACE MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD JOHN STEELE Chair
None on record
Graham Messervy-Whiting Trustee 07 June 2021
None on record
CLAIRE DAVIES Trustee 04 June 2018
None on record
Helen Cook Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
BRYONY GASKELL Trustee 03 June 2013
None on record
BIDDY HOOD Trustee
None on record
NORMAN MACLEOD Trustee
None on record
BRIAN FISHWICK Trustee
None on record
PHIL HANSON Trustee
None on record
SIR MICHAEL PERRY GBE Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF THE MUSEUM OF WORCESTER PORCELAIN
Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days
THE PERRY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DYSON PERRINS MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.43k £16.22k £24.69k £14.34k £12.21k
Total expenditure £34.50k £16.30k £11.74k £11.23k £19.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £800 £10.00k £18.60k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 March 2025 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 November 2024 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Swan Orchard
Alfrick
WORCESTER
WR6 5HZ
Phone:
01886833094
Website:

No information available