THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL BRIGHTON

Charity number: 1206717
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

he advancement of the Christian religion for the public benefit. Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation by maintaining a church building that is open throughout the day. Pastoral work, including visitation of the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups and school assemblies.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST PAUL'S CHURCH, BRIGHTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Mary Alves Gale Trustee 21 April 2024
ST PAULS CLERGY HOUSE AND SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
Carolyn Elgar Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Po Lam Pange Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
John Charles Burdett Trustee 30 April 2023
ST PAULS CLERGY HOUSE AND SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
Christine Irene El-Shabba Trustee 30 April 2023
BRIGHTON AND HOVE SEASIDE COMMUNITY HOMES LIMITED
Received: On time
Ruth Cowl Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Tina Windham Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Jeremy Watkin Dutton Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Jane Richards Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Victor de Giorgio Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Adrian Girvan Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Mark Geoffrey Gourley Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Father Thomas James Cotterill Trustee 04 July 2022
ST PAULS CLERGY HOUSE AND SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
Michael O'Brien Trustee 30 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
St Paul's Church
West Street
Brighton
BN1 2RE
Phone:
01273203231