Financial history BARTON-LE-STREET VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £100 £18.57k £1.60k £4.68k £2.27k
Total expenditure £1.47k £2.05k £13.31k £3.15k £2.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.43k N/A N/A N/A