POYNTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide recreational and educational activities to local women
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 21 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Wainwright | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Marsham | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Bentley | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Brain | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Ann Harris | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Amanda Williams | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Sharples | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth O'Brien | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Moult | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen O'Sullivan | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Eve Hurst | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Marsden | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Julie Skelton | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Johnson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Arrowsmith | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOV 2013
Charitable objects
3. THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL AREAS INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION): I. LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ISSUES OF POLITICAL AND SOCIAL IMPORTANCE; II. MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS; AND III. ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, CRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, SCIENCE, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE; (B) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: I. EDUCATING PEOPLE IN THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; AND II. PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (C) TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND (D) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND VOLUNTEERING. 4. IN RULE 3 “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT GENERATION WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR NEEDS. 5. THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION IN THEIR COMMUNITIES, OF DEVELOPING THEIR CAPACITY AND SKILLS, AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION STANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Fielding Avenue
Poynton
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK12 1YX
- Phone:
- 07912101870
- Email:
- POYNTONWI@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window