Financial history GREAT OUSEBURN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.74k £22.47k £22.47k £14.07k £33.19k
Total expenditure £24.29k £17.68k £17.68k £33.49k £25.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A