CANOLFAN HYFFORDDI COLEG Y BALA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coleg y Bala is a youth and childrens centre owned by the Presbyterian Church of Wales. The purpose of the college is to arrange courses that follow biblical themes. Every aspect of the work of the college is aimed at encouraging a personal faith in Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 May 1971: Standard registration
- COLEG Y BALA (Working name)
- PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF WALES YOUTH SERVICE HEADQUARTERS AND TRAINING CENTRE (Previous name)
- PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH YOUTH SERVICE HEADQUARTERS AND TRAINING CENTRE (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Huw Lloyd POWELL-DAVIES | Chair | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Parch Rebecca Lalbiaksangi | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Marian Lloyd Roberts | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Marian Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Parch Emyr Bowen Williams | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Arall Timothy Huw HODGINS | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Parch Nan Wyn POWELL-DAVIES | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Parch Owain Idwal DAVIES | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Parch Hywel Rhys EDWARDS | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Parch Huw Dylan JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
BRYN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
HYWEL LLOYD DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Glenda Elizabeth DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.08k | £164.47k | £144.42k | £187.59k | £182.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.35k | £146.45k | £129.21k | £172.80k | £181.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.00k | £10.00k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 19TH MARCH, 1971, AS REPLACED BY SCHEME OF 28 CHWEFROR 2008 (28 FEBRUARY 2008)
Charitable objects
(1) AMCAN YR ELUSEN YW SEFYDLU CANOLFAN HYFFORDDI GRISTNOGOL I DDARPARU CANOLFAN I BLANT A PHOBL IEUAINC, O GYMRU A'R BYD, EU HYFFORDDWYR, ARWEINWYR A GWEINIDOGION ER MWYN DYSGU A CHYNORTHWYO PLANT A PHOBL IEUANC I DDATBLYGU EY CYNEDDFAU CORFFOROL, MEDDYLIOL AC YSBRYDOL AC I'W GALLUOGI HWY A'U TEULUOEDD I GYRRAEDD AEDDFEDRWYDD LLAWN FEL UNIGOLION AG AELODAU O GYMDEITHAS A CHYFOETHOGI ANSAWDD EU BYWYD HEB WAHANIAETHU AR SAIL CREFYDD, ENWADAETH GREFYDDOL, RHYW, CENEDL NA GALLU. (2) OS, AC I'R GRADDAU NA ELLIR DEFNYDDIO'R EIDDO ER MWYN YR AMCANION UCHOD YNA'R AMCAN FYDD I HYRWYDDO GWAITH CREFYDDOL A GAWITH ELUSENNOL ARALL EGLWYS BRESBYTERAIDD CYMRU. (3) YN AMODOL AR DDARPARIAETHAU CYMAL 24 RHAID I'R TIR A NODIR YN RHAN 1 ATODLEN Y CYNKKUM HWN EI DDAL GAN YR YMDDIRIEDOLWYR ER MWYN AMCANION YR ELUSEN. (1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ESTABLISH A CHRISTIAN TRAINING CENTRE TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM WALES AND THE WORLD, THEIR INSTRUCTORS, LEADERS AND MINISTERS WITH THE OBJECT OF EDUCATING AND ASSISTING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND OF ENABLING THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IRRESPECTIVE OF RELIGION, RELIGIOUS DENOMINATION, SEX, NATIONALITY OR ABILITY. (2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE PROPERTY CANNOT BE USED FOR THE OBJECTS ABOVE THEN THE OBJECT SHALL BE TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF WALES. (3) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISION OF CLAUSE 24 THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE OEBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coleg Y Bala
Ffordd Ffrydan
BALA
Gwynedd
LL23 7RY
- Phone:
- 01678520565
- Email:
- colegybala@ebcpcw.cymru
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window