LLANSANTFFRAID POOL AND LLANSANTFFRAID DEUDDWR VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
basically non profit making body providing function facilties for local other charities & bodies within the Community and in our Hall premises
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 29 September 1964: Standard registration
- LLANSANTFFRAID COMMUNITY HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
James Sinclair Bain | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
BETHAN MAIR HAULWEN CROSS | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Samantha Sarah Williams | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
DOUGLAS VAUGHN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.46k | £15.25k | £2.92k | £6.45k | £16.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.73k | £13.12k | £7.75k | £5.49k | £18.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22ND MARCH 1952
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
LLANSANTFFRAID POOL AND LLANSANTFFRAID DEYTHEUR & VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bryn Coed
LLANSANTFFRAID
Powys
SY22 6XR
- Phone:
- 01691828962
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window