Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHETSTONE IN THE DIOCESE OF LONDON
Charity Number: 1209469
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kimberley QUAK-WINSLOW | Chair | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret WAKEHAM | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Ruth COPPING | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Brenda MARSHALL | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert WRIGHT | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison JACKSON | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
CATHERINE MITRI | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathryn MACCARTHY | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Marguerite BRERETON | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary LONGFELLOW | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
James DEMPSEY | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Gillian JONES | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Heather TSIOUPRA | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Heather KASHI | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN VINCENT WAKEHAM | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.