JOINT COUNCIL FOR THE PARISHES OF ROGATE WITH TERWICK AND TROTTON WITH CHITHURST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all; the provision of sacred space for prayer and contemplation; pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. All within the ecclesiastical parishes of Rogate with Terwick and Trotton with Chithurst.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 July 2024: Standard registration
- 12 August 2024: Funds received from 1133916 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Edward Michael Doyle | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Trevor Munday | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Octavia Pollock | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Isobel Anne Rae | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Eleanor Marina Boam | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Howat | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
LADY BRIDGET NIXON | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Townshend | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Field | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rita Harrison-Roach | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES WARD | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Elizabeth Craven MA PGCE | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
FYNING LANE
ROGATE
PETERSFIELD
GU31 5EE
- Phone:
- 01730821576
- Email:
- rector@rogatevillage.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.