THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DALTON AND IRELETH WITH ASKAM IN THE DIOCESE OF CARLISLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 February 2025: Standard registration
- DALTON & IRELETH WITH ASKAM PCC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev THOMAS IAN SAMPLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
BARBARA NATALIE IRWIN | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
WILHELMINA JOHANNA ROBINSON | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Caine | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||
JENNIFER TOMLINSON | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ian Honeyman | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
SHEILA EUNICE MARSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MADGE BETHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
CAROLE RIGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
BRENDA KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JILL CORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JACQUELINE PRESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
EDITH MARGARET WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH ELEANOR SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DEBRA ANN ALBION | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Beverly Ann Louw | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
DORIS ELIZABETH BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary's Vicarage
Market Place
Dalton in Furness
Cumbria
LA15 8AZ
- Phone:
- 01229462526
- Email:
- vicar@daltonparish.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.