ABBEYFIELD WORLD COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- Canada
- Jersey
- Malawi
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 10 March 2025: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Dumbleton | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Walker | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Hayes | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andre Decraene | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joseph McReynolds | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Vanessa Brown | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Brian Williams | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Geraldine Gilpin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nandi Segbedzi | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 MAR 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 MAR 2025
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND CARE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO THEIR AGE, ILL-HEALTH, SOCIAL ISOLATION OR DISABILITIES BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ABBEYFIELD FAMILY AND ITS NATIONAL ORGANISATIONS AROUND THE WORLD, INCLUDING SHARING BEST PRACTICE IN THE RELIEF AND ARE OF PREDOMINANTLY OLDER PEOPLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
Portland House
Belmont Business Park
DURHAM
DH1 1TW
- Phone:
- +27827407147
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.