1ST CORNELLY SCOUT AND GUIDE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 524941
Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MAINTAINING AND UPGRADING THE SCOUT & GUIDE HQ IN NORTH CORNELLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ORGANISATIONS THAT OPERATE OUT OF THE PREMISES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010

Total income: £16,943
Total expenditure: £15,018

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bridgend

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CORNELLY SCOUT AND GUIDE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
  • CORNELLY SCOUTS AND GUIDES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Scout Association Trustee
26TH CAMBRIDGE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
1ST PENYCAE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
1ST TETTENHALL WOOD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S, PERRY BARR, 236TH BIRMINGHAM SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
15TH REIGATE (CHIPSTEAD) SCOUT GROUP
Received: 2 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £2.23k £8.63k £14.56k £17.85k £16.94k
Total expenditure £2.02k £6.69k £14.36k £17.90k £15.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Scout Association
Meadow Street
North Cornelly
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF33 4LL
Phone:
01656
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available