AWL BRO PADARN LMA CIO

Charity Number: 1213238
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Ceredigion

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 2025: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BRO PADARN LOCAL MINISTRY AREA (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raymond Paul QUANT Chair 27 November 2024
Borth Community Hub
Received: On time
BORTH SPORTS AND PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ROY WALFORD JONES Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Revd Canon Andrew Graham Loat Trustee 06 December 2024
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth James Trustee 06 December 2024
BORTH SPORTS AND PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SYDNEY GEORGE SMITH Trustee 03 December 2024
CYMDEITHAS CEREDIGION I'R DEILLION - CARDIGANSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
DELYTH HOPKINS EVANS Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
CYNG GARETH DAVIES Trustee 30 November 2024
THE LADY GRACE JAMES MEMORIAL FUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
ELUNED RUTH ALISON SWANSON Trustee 27 November 2024
THE IRON ROOM (EGLWYSFACH)LIMITED
Received: On time
EGLWYSFACH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
ELIZABETH DELYTH GRIFFITHS Trustee 27 November 2024
None on record
Rev David Lynn Rees BA(Hons), MSc, MBA(HRM) Trustee
None on record
Nigel William Hardy Trustee
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Saunders MA Trustee
None on record
Marie Powell Trustee
None on record
Gillian Mary Olewicz Trustee
None on record
Susan Jenkins BA Trustee
None on record
Richard Eynon Huws MLib (Wales) FLA Trustee
None on record
Ann Margaret Hopkins Trustee
None on record
Heulwen Ann Barlow Trustee
None on record
Ruth Jenkins Trustee
None on record
Dewi Evans Trustee
None on record
Delyth Mair Morris-Jones Trustee
None on record
Meriel Ann Ralphs Trustee
None on record
Dr Valerie Hilda Norrington-Davies MSc PhD Trustee
None on record
David Alan Jones BSc(Hons) Trustee
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
THE VICARAGE
LLANBADARN FAWR
ABERYSTWYTH
SY23 3TT
Phone:
01970624638
Website:

No information available