DAME DOROTHY JEFFREYS' CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the making of charitable grants to individuals and organisations for the benefit of children and young people for educational, training, religious and recreational purposes in a defined area of benefit in the county of Clwyd, North Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 May 1963: Standard registration
- DAME DOROTHY JEFFREYS FOUNDATION (APPRENTICING BRANCH) (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES WILD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Ayee | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HUW JONES | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|||||
BRIAN T NEAL | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM DELMAR JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR JOHN HUMPHRIES CCHEM FRSC | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.66k | £9.78k | £0 | £900 | £900 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.71k | £6.59k | £12.82k | £5.61k | £7.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23 NOVEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 2 MARCH 1988.
Charitable objects
(A) IN PROVIDING FOR ANY VOLUNTARY OR COUNTY SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY LEA (B) IN PROMOTING EDUCATION IN DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH IN WALES OF PERSON UNDER THE AGE OF 25. (C) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25. (D) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY VOLUNTARY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION WHICH PROVIDES FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 2 MARCH 1988.) THE AREA OF BENEFIT MEANS THE AREA CONSISTING OF THE COMMUNITIES OF BANGOR IS-Y-COED, ERBISTOCK, OVERTON AND SESSWICK, THE PENLEY WARD OF THE COMMUNITY OF MEALOR SOUTH AND THE WORTHENBURY WARD OF THE COMMUNITY OF WORTHENBURY, ALL IN THE COUNTY OF CLWYD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Abbey Gardens
Bangor-On-Dee
WREXHAM
Wrexham
LL13 0DZ
- Phone:
- 07411862846
- Email:
- DDJCHARITY@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window