THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, HENLEY-ON-THAMES, IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 February 2025: Standard registration
- TRINITY CHURCH HENLEY PCC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Samuel Brewster | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Chambers | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Peter Thomas | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||
REV DUNCAN CARTER MA (CANTAB) | Trustee | 26 November 1990 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ryeland | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Cowan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter Jones | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stefan Kotas | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jacqueline Harrison | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Simon Cook | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Wilfred Selway | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Michael Forsdike | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Simon Wright | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Abbie Nimmo | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter Greenman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 CHURCH STREET
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 1SE
- Phone:
- 01491574822
- Email:
- admin@trinityatfour.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.