Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOP'S HATFIELD, ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS IN THE DIOCESE OF ST ALBANS
Charity Number: 1212167
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kathryn Jane Alford | Chair | 17 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Valerie Casal | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Garie Jablonski | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Porter | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jablonski | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Edinburgh | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Joanne Spencer | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joan Savage | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GUNN | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Nicola Caroline Shilton | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kim Desmond Banham | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MILLS FISHER | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE MARIE FISHER | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rosina Thomas | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Joy Bennett | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA ANNE WRIGHT | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.