CYMDEITHAS ADDYSG Y GWEITHWYR (GOGLEDD CYMRU) COLEG HARLECH, COLEG HARLECH WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION (NORTH WALES)

Charity number: 525785
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Association's aim is : To deliver high quality, innovative education and training to adults and young people in our communities, with due regard to the Welsh language and culture.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Conwy
  • Denbighshire
  • Flintshire
  • Gwynedd
  • Isle Of Anglesey
  • Powys
  • Wrexham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 1966: Standard registration
  • 06 August 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 06 August 2015: Funds transferred to 1071234 ADDYSG OEDOLION CYMRU / ADULT LEARNING WALES
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CHWEA (N) (Working name)
  • WEA (NORTH WALES) (Working name)
  • COLEG HARLECH (Previous name)
  • COLEG HARLECH WEA (NORTH WALES) (Previous name)
  • CYMDEITHAS ADDYSG Y GWEITHWYR (GOGLEDD CYMRU) COLEG HARLECH, CLOEG HARLECH WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION (NORTH WALES) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £4.09m £4.26m £4.71m £4.97m £6.12m
Total expenditure £4.38m £4.23m £4.79m £5.79m £6.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.37m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £375.00k
Income - Charitable activities £3.78m £4.15m £4.40m £3.97m £3.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £310.00k £118.00k £303.00k £992.00k £30.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £199.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £712.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.38m £4.23m £4.79m £5.79m £4.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £28.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £223.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/12/2013
Own use assets £1.88m £1.91m £1.88m £1.47m £1.01m
Long-term investments £2.20m £1.73m £1.62m £539.00k £0
Other assets £474.00k £966.00k £803.00k £444.00k £1.36m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.12m -£888.00k -£432.00k -£1.10m -£766.00k
Total liabilities £627.00k £832.00k £631.00k £1.02m £511.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 05 January 2015 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 07 January 2015 68 days late
Annual return 31 July 2012 03 December 2013 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 26 March 2014 299 days late
Annual return 31 July 2011 24 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 27 April 2012 On Time