LOWER BEBINGTON SCHOOL LANDS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity, founded in 1654 by Thomas Green, makes small grants to individuals in university or other higher education, who reside in the area of the parish of St Andrews, Lower Bebington, as it was in 1924. (owing to poor drafting when state education was introduced it cannot be adjusted to suit the current boundary, but see the Poulton Lancelyn Lands Foundation (1998) which covers omitted areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wirral
Governance
- 01 October 1964: Standard registration
- 08 November 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1071450 The Lower Bebington and Poulton Lancelyn Lands Fou...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23k | £3.30k | £3.12k | £3.16k | £3.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £2.20k | £3.00k | £2.83k | £4.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 29 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 16 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 16 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 1924
Charitable objects
FOR FACILITIES NO NORMALLY AFFORDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING, OR WHO HAVE ATTENDED PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS, IN SUBJECTS OF PRACTICAL OR TECHNICAL INSTRUCTION; EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT PLACES OF SECONDARY AND HIGHER EDUCATION ALSO MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES
Area of benefit
LOWER BEBINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window