Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST MARY AT THE WALLS, COLCHESTER, IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD
Charity number: 1213074
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher John Smith | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Prestney | Trustee | 18 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Andrew Taylor | Trustee | 18 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Alan John Drew | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Paul Wakefield | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Alan Green | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Alison Godwin | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Frances Bailey | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Wakefield | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL GORDON HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Marion Patricia Saunders | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann Currell | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Sylvia Taylor | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sara Humphreys | Trustee | 01 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Cronshaw | Trustee | 11 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
Clive Robert Joyce | Trustee | 01 September 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.