CHRIST'S AND NOTRE DAME COLLEGE, LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 526463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of fixed assets to Liverpool Hope University

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • TRUSTEES OF CND (Working name)
  • CHRIST'S COLLEGE, LIVERPOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Most Reverend Malcolm McMahon Chair 01 August 2014
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESAN TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Sr Maureen McKnight Trustee 21 February 2019
None on record
Sr Mary Charles-Murray Trustee 01 August 2014
None on record
Paul Barber Trustee 01 August 2014
THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING
Received: On time
ST MARY'S UNIVERSITY, TWICKENHAM
Received: On time
FORMATIO
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
The Cathedrals Group of Universities
Received: On time
EDMUND PLOWDEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE DON BROOME SCOUT TRUST
Received: On time
SAINT WILLIAM OF YORK YOUTH GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Era Street
SALE
M33 3AH
Phone:
01512913233