ROSS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ross Educational Foundation offers grants to students up to the age of 25 whose homes are within the boundaries of Ross Urban or Ross Rural Parish Council. Grants are awarded for books, equipment, etc, to students following higher education courses & those learning professional or skilled trades. Students studying music & other arts may also apply.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 09 October 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE MARGARET MELLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Julian Timothy Hallett | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Linden Delves | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN HAZLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL DENEEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL BARRINGTON PASCOE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.22k | £3.85k | £3.23k | £3.31k | £3.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £1.87k | £3.59k | £4.02k | £3.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 1 OCTOBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF ROSS ON WYE AND THE PARISH OF ROSS RURAL AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF ROSS ON WYE AND THE PARISH OF ROSS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Office, The Rectory
Church Street
ROSS-ON-WYE
Herefordshire
HR9 5HN
- Phone:
- 01989 562175
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window