Accounts and annual returns JOHN TOWNSHEND

Charity number: 527445
Charity reporting is overdue by 1474 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 378 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 378 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 744 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 744 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1109 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1109 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1474 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1474 days