JOHN COOPER'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Allocate small grants to Students taking degree courses. Students must be resident in one of these villages. Long Marston.Quinton.Dorsington.Pebworth.Welford on Avon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Waller | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Morrow | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Neville | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donald Lindsay | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Scopes | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nick Ash | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MILLIKEN | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|||||
COLIN JAMES DRUMMINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TUDOR GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £1.86k | £1.90k | £1.93k | £1.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £2.08k | £1.58k | £1.08k | £2.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2022 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 May 2021 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22ND APRIL 1910 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 23RD DECEMBER 1936.
Charitable objects
1. THE AWARD OF EXHIBITIONS FOR THE PURPOSES OF INSTRUCTION HIGHER THEN ELEMENTARY (INCLUDING TECHNICAL, PROFESSIONAL OR INDUSTRIAL INSTRUCTION.) 2. THE AWARD OF MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION HIGHER THEN ELEMENTARY; 3. PAYMENT OF EVENING SCHOOL FEES; 4. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS,ALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF MARSTON SICCA,QUINTON,DORSINGTON AND WELFORD-ON-AVON ALL IN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE AND THE PARISH OF PEBWORTH IN THE COUNTY OF HERERFORD AND WORCESTER
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOXLEY COTTAGE
WELFORD ROAD
LONG MARSTON
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 8RH
- Phone:
- 01789720497
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window