WILLOUGHBY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity established and now maintains a library and art gallery which is open to the public. It promotes the study and education and a knowledge of literature, the arts and music in Lincolnshire by organising art exhibitions, an annual art competition, an annual poetry competition for schools and by giving grants and loans for study, education and knowledge to organisations and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARONESS NANCY JANE MARIE WILLOUGHBY DE ERESBY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES JOHN HOUSEAGO | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Tracey Lamming | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Margaret Barton | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ANNE WILSON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Woolley | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|||||
JOHN KIRKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.98k | £48.84k | £36.62k | £39.83k | £40.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.20k | £30.94k | £35.81k | £36.67k | £35.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/11/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A LIBRARY AND ART GALLERY FOR PROMOTING THE STUDY, EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF LITERATURE, ART AND MUSIC AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OR PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT ABOVE IT MAY BE APPLIED IN PROMOTING THE STUDY, EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND THOSE PARTS OF THE NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES WITHIN A 25 MILE RADIUS OF CORBY GLEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESTATE OFFICE
GRIMSTHORPE
BOURNE
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE10 0LY
- Phone:
- 01778591205
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window