Financial history THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF WILLIAM AVERY

Charity number: 528702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/06/2020 24/06/2021 24/06/2022 24/06/2023 24/06/2024
Total gross income £795 £808 £829 £846 £1.23k
Total expenditure £1.00k £550 £470 £320 £370
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A