ST PAUL'S PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS

Charity Number: 528736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the Trust is the provision of buildings, their maintenance and improvement for St Paul's School, Leamington Spa. The Trustees can permit some properties to be used by the Vicar of St Paul's Church for Christian education of the people of the Parish (in line with the provisions of an Indenture dated 30th June 1911).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,542
Total expenditure: £9,544

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Frederick John Lewin Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
CHARLES DUNCAN TIMOTHY CROW Trustee 13 July 2020
None on record
RICHARD JOHN DUXBURY Trustee 17 November 2019
None on record
REVEREND JONATHAN NOEL JEE Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, LEAMINGTON PRIORS
Received: On time
THE COVENTRY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
COVENTRY DIOCESAN EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.79k £905 £10.21k £10.40k £10.54k
Total expenditure £2.67k £10.96k £4.16k £7.80k £9.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 25 OCTOBER 1929
Charitable objects
REPAIR AND MIANTENANCE OF THE BUILDINGS BELONGING TO THE SCHOOL CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 02 March 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St. Pauls Church
Leicester Street
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV32 4TE
Phone:
07580049961
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available