WILLIAM TEMPLE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 528790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To engage in original research in the designated fields of the William Temple Foundation; to provide facilities, resources, training, etc to students, practioners and others working in the same fields; to maintain links with institutions and groups working in related areas, nationally and internationally and to provide opportunities for the dissemination of learning through seminars &publications.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £21,386
Total expenditure: £23,526

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Lancashire
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dr Paul Malcolm Spenser Monk Trustee 22 March 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS', CLARKSFIELD, OLDHAM.
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, WATERHEAD
Received: On time
HOLY TRINITY COMMUNITY CENTRE
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
Received: On time
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID
Received: On time
Prof Edward Francis Abbott-Halpin Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Rev Dr Ericcson Tinashe Mapfumo Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Tariq Mahmood Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Rev Dr Deidre Renee Brower Latz Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Ian Robert Mayer DL Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
JOHN STUART BRIDGEMAN CBE TD DL Trustee 16 October 2020
THE SUNSHINE CENTRE
Received: On time
Rev YAZID SAID Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Professor Simon Francis Lee Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Dr Helen Mary Reid Trustee 17 November 2017
None on record
The Very Reverend PETER JOHN ALAN ROBINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.94k £20.13k £21.80k £23.18k £21.39k
Total expenditure £37.16k £34.26k £33.82k £88.40k £23.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 April 2023 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o ATHERDEN & CO
PO BOX 660
ASHLEY
ALTRINCHAM
WA14 3UZ
Phone:
01619291616
Website:

williamtemplefoundation.org.uk