THE WALSALL BLUE COAT CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOLS

Charity number: 528803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As owners of three separate school sites we donate sums of money to the Governing bodies to help with the maintenance of the buildings and old boundary walls, on site tree lopping and felling etc and improving school activities. Recently a large sums of money have been used for the refurbishment of a school house, which will now be used for education purposes by the Infant and Junior Federation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £15,478
Total expenditure: £26,266

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Walsall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jim Trood Chair 25 February 2015
HARPERS, MARSH AND CRUMPS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Jeremy Peter Sargent Trustee 27 February 2020
ST MATTHEWS CHURCH YOUTH CENTRE
Received: On time
THE VINE TRUST WALSALL
Received: 78 days late
John Pryce-Jones Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record
Patti Lane Trustee 06 October 2015
None on record
DANIEL BARKER Trustee 06 July 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEWS, WALSALL, DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD
Received: On time
DOROTHY MARY BUCHANAN B ED Trustee
WALSALL CENTRAL HALL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.15k £10.28k £12.61k £15.09k £15.48k
Total expenditure £31.78k £1.53k £6.62k £12.50k £26.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 1854 AND SCHEME OF 19/09/1956
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL PRIZE TO BE AWARDED TO ONE BOY AND ONE GIRL FOR SCRIPTURE AND GENERAL INFORMATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 06 August 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
21 York Gardens
Finchfield
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV3 9BY
Phone:
01922620748
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available