THE SIR WHITWORTH WALLIS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fund a six month Fellowship to facilitate an artist in undertaking research and developing their work. During the Fellowship there will be access to the collections of the Birmingham Museum and Art Gallery. The objective of the Fellowship is for an artist to undertake research and development to further advance their artistic skills and knowledge and to make a presentation to Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 September 1968: Standard registration
- THE SIR WHITWORTH WALLIS TRUST (ICW BIRMINGHAM COLLEGE OF ART AND DESIGN) (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS Amanda NW Stokes-Roberts | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rebecca Unsworth | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katy Wade | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Tromans | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Wigley | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Toby Watley | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Clayton Shaw | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Charles Stuart Bell CBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78k | £1.84k | £1.90k | £1.96k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.60k | £449 | £1.98k | £1.95k | £1.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH JULY, 1968.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FINE ART AND THE STUDY OF FINE ART AMONGST THE STUDENTS OF THE COLLEGE OF ART AND DESIGN, BIRMINGHAM BY APPLYING THE INCOME FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE PROVISION ANNUALLY, OR AT SUCH WIDER INTERVAL AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARSHIPS, OR PRIZES TO OR FOR SUCH ONE OR MORE OF THE STUDENTS WHO SHALL HAVE PAINTED DURING THE PRECEDING YEAR THE BEST AND MOST DESERVING PICTURE IN WATER COLOURS OR OILS OF A SCENE HAVING SOME REFERENCE TO OR CONNECTION WITH THE SEA OR A PICTURE OTHERWISE INSPIRED BY MARINE SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRMINGHAM CITY COUNCIL
ZONE G02
10 Woodcock Street
BIRMINGHAM
B7 4BL
- Phone:
- 01213032691
- Email:
- leigh.nash@birmingham.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window